IL SB2802 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may operate a motor vehicle that has been registered but does not display a current and valid Illinois registration sticker provided that he or she has proof, in the form of a printed receipt from the Secretary, that he or she has registered the vehicle before the previous registration's expiration but has not yet received a new registration sticker from the Secretary. Provides that this printed proof of registration is only valid for 30 days from the expiration of the previous registration sticker's date.
Title
PROOF OF VEHICLE REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1103 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 21, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |