IL SB2770 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0856
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Water Supply Operations Act. Provides that every community water supply in Illinois, with specified exemptions, shall have on its operational staff, and shall designate to the Agency in writing, either (i) one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises both the treatment and distribution facilities of the community water supply or (ii) one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises the treatment facilities of the community water supply and one Responsible Operator in Charge who directly supervises the distribution facilities of the community water supply. Defines "Responsible Operator in Charge". Establishes duties of Responsible Operators in Charge. Provides that a violation of the Act by a Responsible Operators in Charge shall be enforceable by administrative citation. Changes certain references from "natural person" and "person" to "individual". Defines "official custodian" and "person". Provides that the Agency may investigate violations of the Act or any rule adopted under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB WATER SUPPLY OPERATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0856 |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date August 4, 2014 |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment |
2014-05-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Environment; 006-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Environment |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 23.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 45 | 9.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 45 | 9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |