IL SB2721 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Provides that the approval of bonds authorized to be issued under the Counties Code and approved by Jackson County voters in a 1994 referendum, of which less than $200,000 were issued, and for which the purpose of the bonds is flooding prevention, shall remain approved for 25 years after the date of the referendum. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-LOCAL GOVT DEBT REFORM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0655 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Effective Date June 18, 2014 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-013-000 |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 350 | 17.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |