IL SB2669 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a person shall not carry a concealed firearm onto private real property of any type without prior permission from the property owner. Provides that a real property owner shall indicate permission to carry concealed firearms onto the property by clearly and conspicuously posting a sign at the entrance of a building, premises, or real property under his or her control, except this posting is not required if the property is a private residence. Provides that the sign shall be at least 4 inches by 6 inches in size (rather than exactly that size). Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM CONCEALED CARRY-SIGNS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-02-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2669&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2669.htm |