IL SB2664 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-24 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-24 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that the purchaser of a condominium unit at a judicial foreclosure sale, other than a mortgagee, or a purchaser of a condominium unit from a mortgagee who acquired title through a judicial foreclosure, a consent foreclosure, a common law strict foreclosure, or the delivery of a deed in lieu of foreclosure (instead of the purchaser of a condominium unit at a judicial foreclosure sale, other than a mortgagee, who takes possession of a condominium unit pursuant to a court order or a purchaser who acquires title from a mortgagee) shall have the duty to pay to the association an amount not to exceed the total of the regular monthly assessments for the condominium unit for the 9-month period immediately preceding the relevant event. Provides that the amount due may include any attorney's fees and court costs, but may not exceed 9 months of regular assessments due over the same 9-month period. Deletes language providing that the purchaser shall have the duty to pay the proportionate share, if any, of the common expenses for the unit which would have become due in the absence of any assessment acceleration for the 6 months immediately preceding the institution of an action to enforce the collection of assessments, and which remain unpaid. Deletes language providing that if the outstanding assessments are paid at any time during an action to enforce the collection of assessments, the purchaser shall have no obligation to pay any assessments which accrued before he or she acquired title. Provides that the notice of a foreclosure sale of a condominium unit shall state that a purchaser, other than a mortgagee, shall pay to the association any unpaid monthly assessments for the 9-month period preceding the sale, including attorney's fees and court costs. Provides that each notice of a judicial sale a condominium unit and each disclosure statement issued to a prospective purchaser shall list the required fees. Provides that in certain situations, the Board of Managers (instead of the owner) of a condominium unit must make specified information available within 14 days of the request (instead of "upon demand") and may do so either electronically or in writing. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CONDO ASSESSMNT-NONPAYMNT-LIEN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-24 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto No Positive Action Taken |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 19, 2014 |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-047-005 |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-05-14 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 013-002-000 |
2014-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-001 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 22.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |