IL SB2636 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Includes myoclonic-astatic epilepsy in the definition of "debilitating medical condition". Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules for the issuance of a registry identification card for qualifying patients who are under 18 years of age and suffering from myoclonic-astatic epilepsy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS PILOT PRGM-EPILEPSY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-30 - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0775
2014-07-21SenateEffective Date January 1, 2015
2014-07-21SenateGovernor Approved
2014-06-10SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2014-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-002-000
2014-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
2014-05-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
2014-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2014-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2014-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2014
2014-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2014-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-018-000
2014-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2014-05-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico
2014-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2014-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2014-05-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2014-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2014-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2014-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2014-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2014-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2014-05-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2014-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
2014-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2014-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2014-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2014-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2014-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2014-04-28HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2014-04-23HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2014-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth
2014-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2014-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2014-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2014-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2014-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2014-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2014-04-04HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin
2014-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2014-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2014-04-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-04-03HouseFirst Reading
2014-04-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2014-04-03HouseArrived in House
2014-04-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-005-002
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2014-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2014-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014
2014-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2014-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014
2014-03-26SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2014-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2014-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2014-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2014-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2014-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2014-02-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2014-02-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2014-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2014-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2014-01-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-01-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2014-01-29SenateAssigned to Public Health
2014-01-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2014-01-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-01-21SenateFirst Reading
2014-01-21SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41013010Amended CodeCitation Text
41013060Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2636&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636ham002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2636enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-0775.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2636_04022014_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800SB2636_05212014_024000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2636_05302014_023000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback