IL SB1842 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the administration of the Code.
Title
VEH CD-MECHANIC'S LIEN-VEHICLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1161 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-11-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2014-11-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-11-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-11-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |