IL SB0587 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Article and definitions.
Title
SCH CD-CAREER & TECH EDUCATOR
Sponsors
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Emily McAsey [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] |
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0751 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-22 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |