IL SB0341 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning tax credits for providing child care for employees.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2013-11-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-11-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-11-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-11-07 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 6, 2013 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 210.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |