IL SB0220 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
COMMISSION ON VOLUNTEERISM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0674 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 30, 2014 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 038-019-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-019-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-005-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-005-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-049-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-014-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 147 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |