IL SB0125 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GA OPERATIONS ACT-BARACK OBAMA
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1005 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |