IL HJRCA0005 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a bill shall not become a law without the concurrence of three-fifths of the members elected to each house of the General Assembly if that bill increases a benefit under any pension or retirement system of the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof. Provides that if the Governor vetoes such a bill, then it shall not become law unless it is passed, upon its return, by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house of the General Assembly. Provides that if the Governor returns such a bill with specific recommendations for change to the house in which it originated, then those recommendations may be accepted only by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house of the General Assembly. Provides that an ordinance, resolution, or other action of the governing body of any unit of local government or school district shall not be valid without the concurrence of three-fifths of the members of that governing body if that ordinance, resolution, or other action increases a benefit under any pension or retirement system for officials or employees of that unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof. Provides that a bill, ordinance, resolution, or other action increases a benefit if it increases the amount of an existing benefit, adds a new benefit, or expands the class of persons eligible for a benefit, regardless of whether it includes an increase in contributions or a reduction in any other benefit. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-PENSION INCREASE VOTE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-05HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 46
2012-01-12HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-10-25HouseRead in Full a Second Time - As Amended
2011-10-24HouseRead in Full a First Time - As Amended
2011-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2011-05-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2011-05-05HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2011-05-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2011-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2011-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2011-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2011-04-27HouseAssigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2011-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2011-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May
2011-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2011-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2011-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-01-18HouseRead in Full a First Time
2011-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback