IL HJR0115 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to elevate the national status of Cahokia Mounds and thematically-connected Mound Complexes that are deemed suitable and nationally-significant as a non-contiguous National Historical Park. Alternatively calls upon the President to exercise his authority by Executive Order to designate Cahokia Mounds as a National Monument.
Title
CAHOKIA MOUNDS-NAT'L MONUMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-12-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-12-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-11-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-11-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-11-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=115&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0115.htm |