IL HJR0109 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the State of Illinois building that houses the Illinois State Museum at 502 South Spring Street in Springfield as the "Alan J. Dixon Building".
Title
ALAN DIXON BLD - ILL ST MUSEUM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 050-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-11-19 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-11-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 |
2014-11-06 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-10-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |