IL HB6294 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the general homestead exemption amount and the long-time occupant homestead exemption amount shall be doubled for homestead property that is negatively affected by aircraft noise from Chicago O'Hare International Airport. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-O'HARE HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-09-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6294&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6294.htm |