IL HB6289 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In provisions providing that a unitary business group does not include members whose business activity outside the United States is 80% or more of that member's total business activity, provides that the phrase "United States" means only the 50 states, the District of Columbia, and any area over which the United States has asserted jurisdiction or claimed exclusive rights with respect to the exploration for or exploitation of natural resources, but does not include any territory or possession of the United States (currently, for those purposes, "United States" means only the 50 states and the District of Columbia, but does not include any territory or possession of the United States or any area over which the United States has asserted jurisdiction or claimed exclusive rights with respect to the exploration for or exploitation of natural resources). Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces the fees for filing articles of organization, applications for admission, and restated articles of organization to $125 for a series LLC (currently, $750) and $75 for all other LLCs (currently, $500).
Title
REVENUE-INC TX-REDUCE LLC FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-08-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-07-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6289&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6289.htm |