IL HB6218 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Defines the terms "accident" and "injury". Provides that "injury" includes the aggravation of a pre-existing condition by an accident arising out of and in the course of the employment, but only for so long as the aggravation of the pre-existing condition continues to be the major contributing cause of the disability. Provides that an injury resulting directly or indirectly from idiopathic causes is not compensable.
Title
WORKERS COMP-INJURY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-04-02 | House | Chair Rules Appeal Motion out of Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-04-02 | House | Chair Rules recorded vote Not Required |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Lost |
2014-04-02 | House | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-04-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6218&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6218.htm |