IL HB5968 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Reorganizes the provisions concerning definitions. Authorizes the Health Facilities and Services Review Board ("State Board") to prescribe and provide forms pertaining to the State Board Staff Report. Provides that a State Board Staff Report shall pertain to applications that include, but are not limited to, applications for permit or exemption, applications for permit renewal, applications for extension of the obligation period, applications requesting a declaratory ruling, and applications under the Health Care Worker Self-Referral Act. Further provides that the State Board staff shall submit its State Board Staff Report to the State Board for its approval or denial of a permit. Provides that the State Board shall transcribe each State Board meeting using a certified court reporter and the transcript shall contain the record of the findings and decisions of the State Board. Further provides that State Board members shall provide their rationale when voting on an item before the State Board at a State Board meeting and that the transcript of the State Board meeting shall be incorporated into the Board's final decision. Deletes references to the Department of Public Health and replaces those references with the State Board. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH FACILITIES-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1086 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 086-027-000 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Chair placed the bill on Standard Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 5.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |