IL HB5935 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Removes all references to personal care attendants. Amends the Disabled Persons Rehabilitation Act. In provisions concerning the Department of Human Services' Home Services Program, removes the changes made to those provisions by Public Acts 97-732 and 97-1158 and reinserts and reconciles those changes with the changes made by Public Act 97-1019 as follows: Removes references to personal care attendants. Requires the Department to set rates and fees under the Home Services Program in a fair and equitable manner and to pay the same rate for services identical to those offered by the Department on Aging. Provides that home care and home health workers who function as personal assistants and individual maintenance home health workers under the Department's Home Services Program shall be considered public employees under the Illinois Public Relations Act. Requires the State to engage in collective bargaining with an exclusive representative of home care and home health workers who function as personal assistants and individual maintenance home health workers working under the Home Services Program. Makes other changes. Transfers provisions concerning the Home Services Medicaid Trust Fund from the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act to the Disabled Persons Rehabilitation Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-HOME HEALTH WORKERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1004 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-007-001 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Labor and Commerce; 009-004-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 18.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2405 | 5b | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |