IL HB5853 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires each State agency to provide the Department of Central Management Services with contact information for the State agency, including at least one central telephone number and a link to the agency's website, for inclusion on the ITAP.
Title
ITAP-AGENCY CONTACT INFO
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1084 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |