IL HB5736 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that beginning on the effective date of this amendatory Act, implementation of any amendments, additions, subtractions, or changes to an EMS System's Program Plan shall be delayed for a period of 180 days to allow for a hearing and final approval by the Department of Public Health. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-EMS SYSTEM-FINAL APPROVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-26 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-25 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-25 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-12 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham
2010-03-12 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
2010-03-11 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-11 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
2010-03-11 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2010-03-11 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
2010-03-10 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro
2010-03-10 Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2010-03-04 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2010-03-03 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2010-02-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
2010-02-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2010-02-24 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2010-02-22 Assigned to Human Services Committee
2010-02-11 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
2010-02-09 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-09 First Reading
2010-02-09 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback