IL HB5708 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that the knowing possession of not more than 30 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a petty offense charged by a Uniform Cannabis Ticket with a fine of $100 (rather than a Class C misdemeanor for 2.5 grams or less, a Class B misdemeanor for more than 2.5 grams to 10 grams, and a Class A misdemeanor for more than 10 grams to 30 grams). Provides that knowing possession of more than 30 grams but not more than 500 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense (rather than a Class 4 felony) and a Class 4 felony for a subsequent offense (rather than a Class 3 felony). Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Establishes procedures concerning the Uniform Cannabis Ticket.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS PENALTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-05HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014
2014-05-05HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2014-04-11HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-04-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 005-002-000
2014-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote
2014-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2014-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2014-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2014-03-03HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7205501Amended CodeCitation Text
72055010Amended CodeCitation Text
7205504Amended CodeCitation Text
7205509Amended CodeCitation Text
7255111-3.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback