IL HB5692 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uninsured Motorist Verification Advisory Committee Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall establish and appoint an Uninsured Motorist Verification Advisory Committee consisting of representatives of the Department of Insurance and the insurance industry for the purpose of designing an electronic motor vehicle liability insurance verification program, including methods of funding, implementing, and operating the program. Provides that the program must: (1) require insurance companies to make relevant insurance information available to the Secretary; (2) provide a means of electronically verifying motor vehicle liability insurance policies; (3) require the Secretary to verify the existence of a liability insurance policy for every motor vehicle registered in Illinois once every 12 months; (4) allow the Secretary to request information from motor vehicle owners whose liability insurance cannot be verified; (5) suspend the registration of any motor vehicle owner that fails to respond or whose response shows the motor vehicle is not covered; (6) require insurance companies to assist the Secretary in verifying insurance information submitted in response to an information request; (7) authorize the Secretary to perform additional insurance verifications. Provides that this proposed legislation must not give the Secretary regulatory authority over insurance companies. Requires the Secretary to adopt rules for the electronic motor vehicle liability insurance verification system by January 1, 2016, subject to appropriation. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2016. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes the requirement that applicants for vehicle registration provide insurance information for the vehicle for which registration issuance or renewal is being sought. Removes the provision that submission of false insurance information with a vehicle registration application is a Class C misdemeanor. Repeals the Section requiring remittance agents remitting vehicle registration applications to ask customers for the vehicle's insurance information. Provides that current procedures for insurance verification is repealed on December 31, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
VEHICLE INSURANCE VERIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0787 |
2014-07-25 | House | Effective Date July 25, 2014 |
2014-07-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-918 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |