IL HB5686 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a court lacks jurisdiction to proceed on a petition for the appointment of a guardian of a minor if it finds that there is a short-term guardian appointed who is fit, willing, and able to care for the minor and that when the petitioner is not the short-term guardian of the minor, there shall be a rebuttable presumption that the short-term guardian of the minor is fit, willing, and able to care for the minor and that the petitioner shall have the burden of proving that the short-term guardian is not fit, willing, or able to care for the minor or that the short-term guardianship has been vacated. Further provides that the appointment of a short-term guardian does not constitute parental consent for court appointment of a guardian. Provides that if a short-term guardian appointed by the minor's parent or guardian petitions for guardianship or standby guardianship, his or her petition must state certain facts concerning his or her appointment as short-term guardian and include a copy of the short-term guardianship appointment with the petition. Provides that a guardian of a minor shall not remove a minor from the State for more than 30 days without first petitioning the court for removal and obtaining leave of the court.
Title
PROBATE ACT - GUARDIANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1082 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-001-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |