IL HB5660 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Energy Conservation and Coal Development Act and the Illinois Coal Technology Development Assistance Act. Removes provisions requiring the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to carry out programs to increase public awareness and education regarding Illinois coal. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY CONSERV & COAL DEV ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2014-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status Chair placed on Standard Debate |
2014-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-03-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 009-006-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1105 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 730 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 730 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |