IL HB5593 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that a park district that serves a population within at least 2, but no more than 4, municipalities and serves within a county with a population greater than 100,000 but less than 200,000 shall have a board of commissioners consisting of 9 members (instead of 5 members) that includes 4 appointed commissioners. Sets forth the procedures for appointing the commissioners and the length of their initial and subsequent terms.
Title
PARK DISTRICT-ELECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0928 |
2014-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-002 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-005-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-012-002 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 013-001-000 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 015-001-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |