IL HB5503 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that each fiscal year, within 30 days of the close of an audit of the county's funds and accounts, the auditor conducting the audit shall: (1) provide a copy of any management letter and a copy of any audited financial statements to each member of the county board; and (2) present the information from the audit to the county board either in person or by a live phone or web connection during a public meeting. Provides that if the county maintains an Internet website, the county board shall post the information contained in any management letter or financial statements to its website. Makes similar changes in the Illinois Municipal Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVT-AUDIT REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-16HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0738
2014-07-16HouseEffective Date January 1, 2015
2014-07-16HouseGovernor Approved
2014-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2014-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2014-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014
2014-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2014-05-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014
2014-05-07SenateDo Pass Local Government; 012-000-000
2014-04-30SenateAssigned to Local Government
2014-04-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-04-02SenateFirst Reading
2014-04-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2014-04-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014
2014-04-01SenateArrive in Senate
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2014-03-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2014-03-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2014-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2014-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000
2014-02-24HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2014-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5556-31012New CodeSee Bill Text
6558-8-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback