IL HB5431 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Provides that an association or other entity that has, as one of its purposes, promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State shall develop an online certification for high school coaching personnel and athletic directors in concussion awareness and reduction of repetitive sub-concussive hits and concussions. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, online concussion certification is mandatory for all high school coaching personnel, including the head and assistant coaches, and the athletic directors. Sets forth provisions governing certification requirements for coaching personnel and athletic directors hired before and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the mandatory online certification program content shall be updated annually and include a video, and sets forth the topics of focus. Further provides that to pass the concussion certification, coaching personnel and athletic directors shall review the association's online material and demonstrate proficiency on the test developed by the association. Requires the certification to be renewed every 2 years. Provides that high school coaching personnel and athletic directors shall annually require their student athletes to watch the video in the online concussion certification program to increase athlete awareness of the risk of concussion and sub-concussive hits to the head. Provides that high school coaching personnel shall encourage coaches of youth sports organizations to consider this certification. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCUSSION CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1011 |
2014-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2014 |
2014-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-011-000 |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-02-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |