IL HB4759 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that a financial institution shall not be required to provide a product or service that it does not already provide. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC FUNDS INVESTMENT ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Maria Berrios [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-04 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 235 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |