IL HB4687 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Provides that specified shipping fees shall not apply to shipments consisting entirely of cobalt-60 or other medical isotopes, or both.
Title
NUCLEAR SAFETY-COBALT 60
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0728 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |