IL HB4606 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the portion of a site or facility that accepts exclusively general construction or demolition debris and is operated and located in accordance with a specified provision of the Act is not a pollution control facility (previously required the facility to be located in a county with a population over 3,000,000 as of January 1, 2000 or in a county that is contiguous to such a county to fall under the exemption).
Title
EPA-POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 80 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 80 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1130 |
2014-12-08 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-12-04 | House | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 044-001-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto December 3, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 080-031-001 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-12 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 6, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-019-000 |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 3.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |