IL HB4559 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois and the Public Community College Act. With respect to students of a public university or community college who participate in an interscholastic, institution-sponsored, or institution-supported athletic activity, provides that if the athletes for a particular athletic activity are required to wear uniform articles of clothing, whether during practice, during competition, or at any other time, the articles of clothing must be manufactured in the United States. Provides that the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board may adopt any rules necessary to implement and administer these provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-ATHLETIC UNIFORMS
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |