IL HB4530 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Defines "vending machine" as a coin, currency, or debit card operated machine that dispenses goods or services, and includes machines that use utility services. Provides that "vending machine" includes those machines that provide an enclosed space or area for the use of a customer or for the delivery of the goods or services. Excludes machines operated by the United States Postal Service for the sale of postage stamps or other postal products.
Title
MUNI CODE-VENDING
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1153 |
2015-01-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-03 | House | House Concurs |
2014-12-03 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 112-000-001 |
2014-12-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-11-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-11-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2014-11-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-11-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2014-11-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Althoff |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-002-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-023-000 |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-003-000 |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |