IL HB4395 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to convey certain land or release certain land from easement or other rights in McLean, Madison, Logan, Bond, and Cook Counties. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT LAND CONVEYANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0723 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-001 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-001 |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |