IL HB4382 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Removes a provision requiring rule to include a requirement for a local match of 30% of the total project cost for projects funded through grants. Adds to the definition of "treatment works". Provides that the Water Pollution Control Loan Program shall be used and administered by the Environmental Protection Agency to provide any financial assistance that may be provided under a specified provision of the Federal Water Pollution Control Act for any projects eligible for assistance under that provision. Effective immediately.
Title
WATER POLLUTION CONTROL LOANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 19.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |