IL HB4276 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Clarifies that the pre-sale disclosure requirements apply only to life care contracts that are subject to refund. Provides that, upon request, current residents, former residents awaiting refunds, and the estates of former residents awaiting refunds shall be provided with the most recent entry fee refund disclosures. Provides that, if a payee for an entry fee refund cannot be determined, for purposes of calculating the data required in the pre-sale disclosure, a refund shall be considered complete when a new resident occupies the living unit.
Title
LIFE CARE FACILITY-DISCLOSURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-004-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-12-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |