IL HB4204 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Condominium Ombudsperson Act and amends the State Finance Act. Contains legislative findings and defines terms. Within and under the control of the office of the Attorney General, creates the Office of the Condominium Ombudsperson. Provides that the Ombudsperson shall offer training and educational materials and courses to condominium unit owners, condominium associations, and boards of managers in subjects relevant to the operation and management of condominium property and the rights and duties of a unit owner or unit owners' association. Requires the Ombudsperson to maintain a statewide toll-free telephone number, maintain certain information on the Attorney General's website, and provide information or assistance on matters relating to condominium property. Requires the Attorney General, based upon Ombudsperson recommendations, to report annually to the General Assembly. Provides that every condominium unit owners' association shall pay an annual fee to the Ombudsperson to cover the administration of the Act. Creates the Condominium Ombudsperson Fund as a special fund in the State treasury, to consist of fees received by the Ombudsperson, to be used exclusively for expenditures necessary for the proper administration of the Act. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2017. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
CONDOMINIUM OMBUDSPERSON ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1135 |
2014-12-29 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2016 |
2014-12-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-03 | House | House Concurs |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-004-000 |
2014-12-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-12-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-11-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-11-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-009-001 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-002-001 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-038-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-03-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |