IL HB4043 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that if a petition is filed for the consolidation of Christopher Unit School District 99 and Zeigler-Royalton Community Unit School District 188, the change is granted and approved at election, and no appeal is taken, then the change shall become effective after one or both of the school districts have been awarded school construction grants under the School Construction Law (instead of after the time for appeal has run for the purpose of all elections). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CONSOLIDATION-EFF DATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-15 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0925
2012-08-10HouseEffective Date August 10, 2012
2012-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2012-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2012-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2012-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-001
2012-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012
2012-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2012-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012
2012-04-18SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2012-04-11SenateAssigned to Education
2012-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2012-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby
2012-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012
2012-03-22SenateArrive in Senate
2012-03-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-002-000
2012-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 023-000-000
2012-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2012-01-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2012-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105511E-70Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback