IL HB3958 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Savings and Loan Share and Account Act. Makes a technical change to a Section relating to joint ownership of accounts.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 002-009-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-002-000 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |