IL HB3793 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Item Veto Stands 98-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Item Veto Stands 98-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Legislative Inspector General for its FY15 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
$LEG IG-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | House | Item Veto Stands 98-0675 |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Item Veto November 6, 2014 |
2014-06-30 | House | Governor Item Veto PA 98-0675 |
2014-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2014; , some portions effective June 30, 2014; some portions effective July 01, 2014. |
2014-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-004 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-048-003 |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |