IL HB3671 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to impose limitations on prescription drugs such that the Department shall not provide reimbursement for more than 4 prescriptions, including 3 brand name prescriptions, for distinct drugs in a 30-day period, unless prior approval is received for all prescriptions in excess of the 4-prescription limit.
Title
MEDICAID-PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-11-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-09-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3671&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3671.htm |