IL HB3388 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides for a training program in animal fighting awareness and humane response for law enforcement officers. Provides that the purpose of the training is to equip law enforcement officers to identify animal fighting operations and respond appropriately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL FIGHTING AWARENESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-28 - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0311
2013-08-12HouseEffective Date January 1, 2014
2013-08-12HouseGovernor Approved
2013-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2013-05-28HouseHouse Concurs
2013-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-012-000
2013-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2013-05-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-05-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly Burke
2013-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2013-05-15HouseArrived in House
2013-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2013-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013
2013-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2013-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013
2013-05-01SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
2013-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2013-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2013-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-04-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-04-16SenateFirst Reading
2013-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013
2013-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2013-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-000
2013-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2013-04-12HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris
2013-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2013-04-12HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2013-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2013-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2013-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2013-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000
2013-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2013-03-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly Burke
2013-03-11HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2013-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5070510.14New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback