IL HB3199 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Planning Act. Requires the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability to hold a public hearing within 30 days after the Governor's Budget Address to the General Assembly to consider CMAP's annual report and its impact on the State budget. Sets forth notification requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
CMAP-ANNUAL HEARING-COGFA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0773 |
2014-07-18 | House | Effective Date July 18, 2014 |
2014-07-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 066-045-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-003-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1707 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |