IL HB2494 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act in relation to on-bill financing programs. Provides for the inclusion of energy efficiency and demand-response plans under those programs.
Title
PUB UTIL ON BILL FINANCING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 78 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1055 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 078-031-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-015-000 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-001-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 6, 2013 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-026-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 19-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |