IL HB2099 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department shall require all licensed child care facility employees who care for newborns and infants to complete training every 3 years on the nature of sudden unexpected infant death (SUID), sudden infant death syndrome (SIDS), and the safe sleep recommendations of the American Academy of Pediatrics.
Title
CHILD CARE ACT-SUID PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0083 |
2011-07-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |