IL HB1490 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that arbitration panels hearing security employee, peace officer, firefighter, and paramedic disputes must not take into consideration the ability of a unit of government to raise taxes or impose new taxes when determining the financial ability of that unit of government to pay the costs associated with those employees' wages and other conditions of employment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR-ARBITRATION-EXCLUDE TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-04-18HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2013-03-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
2013-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-002-000
2013-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
2013-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2013-02-19HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2013-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531514Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback