IL HB1189 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that the initial registration fee and the annual renewal fee shall be collected by the registering agency. Provides that $35 of the initial registration fee and $35 of the annual renewal fee shall be retained by the registering agency and the remaining $65 of the initial registration fee and the remaining $65 of the annual renewal fee shall be remitted by the registering agency within 30 days of receipt to the State Treasurer who shall deposit $5 of the initial registration fee and $5 of the annual renewal fee into the Sex Offender Management Board Fund, $30 of the initial registration fee and $30 of the annual renewal fee into the Sex Offender Registration Fund, and $30 of the initial registration fee and $30 of the annual renewal fee into the Attorney General Sex Offender Awareness, Training, and Education Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER-REG FEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-31 - Concurrence in House (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0508
2013-08-19HouseEffective Date August 19, 2013
2013-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2013-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2013-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2013-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2013-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 070-048-000
2013-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2013-05-31House(M2) Motion to Suspend Rule 15(d) - Prevailed
2013-05-31House(M2) Moved to Suspend Rule 15(d)
2013-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2013-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2013-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2013-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2013-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2013-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2013-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2013-05-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-05-31HouseArrived in House
2013-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-015-001
2013-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2013-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2013-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2013-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2013-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2013-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2013-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2013-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2013-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2013-05-31SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2013-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
2013-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2013
2013-05-22SenateSecond Reading
2013-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013
2013-05-01SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2013-04-16SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2013-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2013-03-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2013-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2013-03-22SenateArrive in Senate
2013-03-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2013-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2013-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2013-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2013-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2013-03-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 019-000-000
2013-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2013-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2013-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2013-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2013-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2013-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301503Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1189&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189ham002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1189enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-0508.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800HB1189_03222013_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800HB1189_05312013_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800HB1189_05312013_053000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback