IL HB0410 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning Chicago municipal employees, officers, and officials.
Title
PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Scott Drury [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 8-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |