IL HB0132 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-03-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts assault weapon registration affidavits. Amends the State Police Act. Authorizes emergency procurement for an assault weapon registration system. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Raises penalty for failure to keep a firearm transfer record. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that after the effective date, it is unlawful to knowingly deliver, sell, or purchase a semi-automatic assault weapon, attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Prohibits possession of these weapons and attachments, 270 days after the effective date. Allows possession of a weapon or attachment possessed before the effective date if the person provides a registration affidavit. Provides that a retired peace officer may possess a weapon or attachment, if lawfully acquired and possessed prior to retirement and a registration affidavit filed. Provides that the person or retired peace officer may only transfer the weapon or attachment to an heir, an individual residing in another state, or a licensed federal firearms dealer. Establishes registration fees. Provides that 60 days after the effective date, it is unlawful to knowingly deliver, sell, purchase, or possess a large capacity ammunition feeding device. Provides exemptions and penalties. Raises gunrunning penalties. Provides that a person who possesses or acquires a handgun, semi-automatic assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, .50 caliber cartridge, or large capacity ammunition feeding device and later loses or has it stolen, must report the loss or theft to law enforcement. Provides severability. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD - ASSAULT WEAPONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-14HouseTo Firearms Subcommittee
2013-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell
2013-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2013-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary
2013-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2013-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261024New CodeSee Bill Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.10New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-3AAmended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback