ID S1418 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,629,200 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 23.75; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for reappropriation of federal funds; and provides guidance with regard to expenditure of funds for the special committees.
Title
Appropriates $5,629,200 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 23.75; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for reappropriation of federal funds; and provides guidance with regard to expenditure of funds for the special committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Thompson |
2014-03-20 | House | 56-10-4 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Boyle, Harris, McMillan, Monks, Palmer, Sims, Trujillo, Wood(35) Absent -- Anderst, Erpelding, Woodings, Youngblood Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Mortimer |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- McKenzie Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |